EP3612511 - EXTRACTION OF NATURAL FERULATE AND COUMARATE FROM BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPERO RENEWABLES, LLC. 6780 Cortona Drive, Suite 150 Goleta, California 93117 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABU-OMAR, Mahdi M. c/o Spero Renewables, LLC 6780 Cortona Dr., Ste. 150 Goleta CA 93117 / US | 02 /
COLLER, Daniel H. c/o Spero Renewables, LLC 6780 Cortona Dr., Ste. 150 Goleta CA 93117 / US | 03 /
KLEIN, Ian M. c/o Spero Renewables, LLC 6780 Cortona Dr., Ste. 150 Goleta CA 93117 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Bradley, Josephine Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 18787967.1 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28566 | Priority number, date | US201762487911P | 20.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762487911 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195422 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612511 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/04, C07C67/58, C07C67/56, C07C51/48, C07C51/47, C11B1/10, B01D11/02, C07C51/43, C07C51/09, C11B3/00, C07C51/487, C11B11/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C11B3/00 (EP);
C07C67/56 (EP,US);
B01D11/028 (US);
B01D11/0284 (EP);
B01D11/0288 (EP,US);
B01D11/0292 (US);
B01D15/08 (US);
C07C51/09 (EP,US);
C07C51/43 (EP);
C07C51/47 (EP,US);
C07C51/48 (EP,US);
C07C51/487 (EP);
C07C67/00 (EP);
C07C67/58 (EP,US);
C11B1/04 (EP);
C11B1/10 (EP);
C11B11/00 (EP);
B01D11/0219 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C59/52 (EP);
C07C51/09, C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C51/43, C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C51/47, C07C59/52 (EP);
C07C51/47, C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C51/487, C07C59/52 (EP);
C07C51/487, C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C51/48, C07C59/64 (EP);
C07C67/00, C07C69/732 (EP);
C07C67/00, C07C69/734 (EP);
C07C67/56, C07C69/732 (EP);
C07C67/56, C07C69/734 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/09] | C07C51/42, C07C59/64, C11B1/04, C11B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION VON NATÜRLICHEM FERULAT UND CUMARAT AUS BIOMASSE | [2020/09] | English: | EXTRACTION OF NATURAL FERULATE AND COUMARATE FROM BIOMASS | [2020/09] | French: | EXTRACTION DE FÉRULATE NATUREL ET DE COUMARATE À PARTIR DE BIOMASSE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1196321 (TOYO KOATSU IND INC) [A] 14 * paragraph [0011] *; | [XYI]US4038481 (ANTRIM RICHARD LEE, et al) [X] 1,3-10 * example -; claim - * * column 4, lines 23-25 * [Y] 3,7,10-12 [I] 2; | [XYI]EP0742012 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,13 * page 10, lines 6-14 * * page 10, lines 38-45 * [Y] 3,7,10-12 [I] 14-17; | [Y]US8114447 (ABBAS CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 6, lines 8-13 *; | [XI] - MADHAV P YADAV ET AL, "A new corn fiber gum polysaccharide isolation process that preserves functional components", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, vol. 87, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2011.08.092, ISSN 0144-8617, (20110827), pages 1169 - 1175, (20110903), XP028112398 [X] 1,3-6,8-10 * section 2.5 * * section 2.1 * [I] 2,7,11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2011.08.092 | International search | [XY]US5843499 (MOREAU ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6 * entire document * [Y] 3-5, 7-13; | [Y]US8114447 (ABBAS CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 3-5, 7, 8, 11-23, 27-32 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2015023583 (MITCHELL MELVIN [US]) [Y] 9-11, 17 * .entire document *; | [Y]WO2012155074 (VIRENT INC [US], et al) [Y] 14-23 * entire document *; | [Y]CN103254993 (SHANDONG SUNNYGRAIN BIOENGINEERING CO LTD) [Y] 22 * see machine translation *; | [Y]US2016145183 (REVELANT DENIS [FR], et al) [Y] 23 * entire document *; | [Y]US5516923 (HEBERT ROLAND M [US], et al) [Y] 27-32 * entire document *; | [A]US5288902 (TANIGUCHI HISAJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-33 * entire document * |