EP3612170 - METHOD FOR MAKING A TRANSDERMAL FENTANYL PATCH WITH EVEN DRUG CRYSTAL DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inep Europe Sarl 6 Place De Nancy Luxembourg 2212 / LU | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOTINOS, Spiros Georgiou Lyra 48 13465 Attika / GR | 02 /
LANGLUME, Jerome 44 avenue Georges Mandel 75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
CARAVITA, Jean, Paul 37 avenue de La Marne 92600 Asnieres Sur Seine / FR | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 18788597.5 | 10.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US26802 | Priority number, date | US201715491419 | 19.04.2017 Original published format: US201715491419 | US201715492146 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: US201715492146 | US201715838977 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: US201715838977 | US201715838837 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: US201715838837 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018194879 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612170 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/4468, A61K31/4535 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/7084 (EP);
A61K31/4468 (EP);
A61K31/4535 (EP);
A61K9/7069 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | A61K9/70, A61K31/4468 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TRANSDERMALEN FENTANYPFLASTERS MIT GLEICHMÄSSIGER ARZNEIKRISTALLVERTEILUNG | [2020/09] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A TRANSDERMAL FENTANYL PATCH WITH EVEN DRUG CRYSTAL DISTRIBUTION | [2020/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TIMBRE TRANSDERMIQUE DE FENTANYL AVEC DISTRIBUTION UNIFORME DE CRISTAUX DE MÉDICAMENT | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2022 | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011111013 (SALMAN NOUHA [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] *; | [X]US2012209223 (SALMAN NOUHA [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 1,2 *; | [XI]US2006078600 (MULLER WALTER [DE]) [X] 7-15 * example 1 * [I] 1-6 | International search | [XY]US2009238861 (MILLER II KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1-18, 20-22 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0014], para [0021]- para [0024], para [0026], para [0029], para [0043], para [0045], para [0050], para [0051], para [0053], para [0057], para [0077], para [0102] * [Y] 19; | [Y]US2014276478 (LIAO JUN [US], et al) [Y] 19 * ; para [0010], para [0013], para [0049], para [0056], fig. 5 *; | [A]WO2016149077 (AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US]) [A] 1-22 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2001033858 (ZHANG JIE [US]) [A] 1-22 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6365178 (VENKATESHWARAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * ; entire document * |