Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3676351
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.06.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 |
Change - English title |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
25.05.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.01.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.01.2024 |
First examination report |
|
10.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
21.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.06.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
24.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|