EP3676351 - METHOD OF SEALING A SERVICE PENETRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/28] | SEALING COMPOSITIONS, METHOD AND USE FOR SEALING A SERVICE PENETRATION | ||
[2024/28] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - German title | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - English title | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - French title | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYSEAM LIMITED 15 St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6SB / GB | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HLUCHAN, Wolodymyr c/o Polyseam Limited 15 St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6SB / GB | 02 /
BOGSTAD, Kjetil c/o Polyseam Limited 15 St. Andrews Road Huddersfield HD1 6SB / GB | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18788826.8 | 09.10.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018GB52877 | Priority number, date | GB20170016599 | 10.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201716599 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019073213 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676351 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/02, C09K21/14, C09K3/10, C08L83/04, E04B1/94, C08K3/013, C08K3/016 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
C09K3/1018 (EP,GB,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (US);
C08K3/013 (EP);
C08K3/016 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP,GB,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,GB,US);
C09K21/00 (EP);
C09K21/02 (EP);
C09K21/14 (GB);
C09K3/1006 (GB);
E04B1/948 (EP);
A62C2/065 (EP);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,GB,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP);
C08K2003/267 (EP,GB,US);
C08K2201/014 (US);
C08L2201/02 (US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2205/06 (US);
C08L2207/324 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K3/26, C08L83/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABDICHTEN EINER SERVICEDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2024/28] | English: | METHOD OF SEALING A SERVICE PENETRATION | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SCELLEMENT D'UNE PÉNÉTRATION DE SERVICE | [2024/28] |
Former [2020/28] | DICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG ZUM ABDICHTEN EINER SERVICEDURCHFÜHRUNG | ||
Former [2020/28] | SEALING COMPOSITIONS, METHOD AND USE FOR SEALING A SERVICE PENETRATION | ||
Former [2020/28] | COMPOSITIONS D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ, PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION DE SCELLEMENT D'UNE PÉNÉTRATION DE SERVICE | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 28.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9411455 (VISPAK LTD [GB], et al) |