EP3717311 - WIPER STRIP FOR A WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIVELLES, Christiaan Grote baan 459 3530 Helchteren / BE | 02 /
BUSEYNE, Wim Prins-Bisschopssingel 39 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18789386.2 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP78396 | Priority number, date | DE201710221299 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017221299 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105648 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717311 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3717311 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP);
B60S1/3879 (EP);
B60S2001/382 (EP);
B60S2001/3829 (EP);
B60S2001/3836 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHLEISTE FÜR EIN WISCHBLATT | [2020/41] | English: | WIPER STRIP FOR A WIPER BLADE | [2020/41] | French: | LAME D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2021 | Decision despatched | 27.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | LU | 17.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB707559 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]US3414930 (MITSURU KODAMA) [X] 1-3,6,8,10,11 * column 4, line 73 - column 5, line 16; figures 8,14 *; | [X]JPS6170172U (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1,2,6,8-11 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH09193750 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10058455 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050]; figure 6 *; | [X]DE102005059432 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016052491 (FRISCIONI THOMAS [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,11 * the whole document * |