EP3689081 - ASYNCHRONOUS SINGLE BEAM DIRECTIONAL LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENDAMARAI KANNAN, Arumugam 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SADEK, Ahmed Kamel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHANDE, Vinay 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
BARGHI, Sanaz 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
KADOUS, Tamer 14157 Green Valley Ct. San Diego, California 92131 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/20] |
Former [2020/32] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18789728.5 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US51926 | Priority number, date | US201762566068P | 29.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762566068 P | US201816135500 | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US201816135500 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067297 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689081 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3689081 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0408, H04B7/06, H04W74/08, // H04W74/00 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W74/006 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASYNCHRONES DIREKTIONALES EINZELSTRAHL-LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK | [2020/32] | English: | ASYNCHRONOUS SINGLE BEAM DIRECTIONAL LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK | [2020/32] | French: | TECHNIQUE ÉCOUTER AVANT DE PARLER DIRECTIONNELLE À FAISCEAU UNIQUE ASYNCHRONE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 27.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24175593.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016086144 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]); |