EP3615029 - FORMULATIONS FOR EXTENDING LIFESPAN AND HEALTHSPAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 07.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buck Institute for Research on Aging 8001 Redwood Boulevard Novato, CA 94945 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEDY, Brian 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | 02 /
LITHGOW, Gordon J. 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | 03 /
WELDON, Thomas 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | 04 /
EDGAR, Daniel 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | 05 /
LUCANIC, Mark 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2020/10] | 01 /
KENNEDY, Brian 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | ||
02 /
LITHGOW, Gordon, J. 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | |||
03 /
WELDON, Thomas 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | |||
04 /
EDGAR, Daniel 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | |||
05 /
LUCANIC, Mark 8001 Redwood Blvd. Novato CA 94945 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 18790088.1 | 25.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US29455 | Priority number, date | US201762489884P | 25.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762489884 P | US201862646734P | 22.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862646734 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018200736 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3615029 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4745, A61K31/19, A61P17/14, A61P43/00, A61P19/00, A61P27/02 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/473 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (KR);
A61K31/194 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A23K20/10 (EP,IL);
A23K20/105 (KR);
A23K20/126 (IL,US);
A23K20/137 (IL,KR,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,IL);
A23L33/155 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/015 (CN,KR);
A61K31/11 (CN);
A61K31/203 (CN,KR,US);
A61K31/215 (US);
A61K31/23 (CN);
A61K31/37 (IL,US);
A61K31/59 (KR);
A61K31/593 (CN);
A61K8/365 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K8/49 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K8/671 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K8/675 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (CN,IL,US);
A61P17/14 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P39/00 (US);
A61P39/06 (CN);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61Q5/00 (KR);
A61Q5/02 (EP,IL);
A61Q5/06 (EP,IL);
A61Q5/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/015, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/11, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/194, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/203, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/23, A61K2300/00 (CN); |
Former IPC [2020/10] | A61K31/4745, A61K31/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER LEBENSDAUER UND DER GESUNDHEIT | [2020/10] | English: | FORMULATIONS FOR EXTENDING LIFESPAN AND HEALTHSPAN | [2020/10] | French: | FORMULATIONS POUR PROLONGER LA DURÉE DE VIE ET LA DURÉE DE VIE EN SANTÉ | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009030453 (CUTECH SRL [IT], et al); | [X]WO2010112362 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al); | [XA]WO2012143405 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al); | [I]WO2016003854 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | International search | [Y]US6451341 (SLAGA THOMAS J [US], et al); | [XY]US2007135376 (HENDERSON SAMUEL T [US]); | [XY]US2008279786 (CASH ALAN B [US]); | [A]US2010124537 (KRUSZEWSKA DANUTA [PL]); | [Y]US2010260733 (QI HAIYAN [US]); | [Y]US2012177759 (LI MING [CN], et al); | [Y]US2016354334 (HUANG JING [US], et al); | [A]US2017037043 (LIU LIPING [US]) |