EP3618425 - DUAL-CORE FOCUSING IMAGE SENSOR, FOCUSING CONTROL METHOD THEREOF, AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Yuanqing No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18790152.5 | 23.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018CN84023 | Priority number, date | CN201710296079 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: CN201710296079 | [2020/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018196704 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618425 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, H04N5/369 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H04N25/704 (EP);
H01L27/14603 (EP,CN);
H04N23/67 (US);
G02B7/285 (US);
G02B7/36 (US);
G03B13/36 (US);
H01L27/14625 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14627 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14643 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | H04N5/335, H01L27/146, H04N5/225, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | ZWEIKERNFOKUSSIERUNGSBILDSENSOR, FOKUSSIERUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/10] | English: | DUAL-CORE FOCUSING IMAGE SENSOR, FOCUSING CONTROL METHOD THEREOF, AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2020/10] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGE BIC UR DE MISE AU POINT, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MISE AU POINT ASSOCIÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2019 | Translation filed | 28.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 30.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2023 | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/39] | 20.05.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 19.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2007103590 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]US2012300104 (ONUKI ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2015062390 (KIM HO SOO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2017052923 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) | International search | [A]JP2010212649 (NIKON CORP); | [A]US2011109776 (KAWAI TOMOYUKI [JP]); | [A]CN105378926 (SONY CORP); | [A]CN105611124 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD); | [A]CN105979160 (CANON KK); | [PX]CN107146797 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) |