EP3615573 - SYNDECAN-1 (CD138) BINDING AGENTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 3-2-10, Dosho-machi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8505 / JP | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORONELLA, Julia 3110 Quebrada Circle Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 02 /
RICHARDSON, Robyn 11356Camarosa Circle San Diego California 92126 / US | 03 /
TIMMER, Anjuli 12993 Seabreeze Farms Dr. San Diego California 92130 / US | 04 /
NEWMAN, Roland 8919, Montrose Way San Diego California 92122 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18790752.2 | 25.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018JP16847 | Priority number, date | US201762490463P | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762490463 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018199176 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615573 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C12N5/10, C12Q1/04, C12N15/13 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | SYNDECAN-1 (CD138)-BINDUNGSMITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2020/10] | English: | SYNDECAN-1 (CD138) BINDING AGENTS AND USES THEREOF | [2020/10] | French: | AGENTS DE LIAISON À SYNDÉCANE-1 (CD138) ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 06.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009080829 (BIOTEST AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US9289509 (OSTERROTH FRANK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2018199176 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [[0088]] *; | [E]US2019100588 (CHAGANTY BHARAT [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - PAOLA ORECCHIA ET AL, "A novel human anti-syndecan-1 antibody inhibits vascular maturation and tumour growth in melanoma", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, Amsterdam NL, (20130501), vol. 49, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.ejca.2012.12.019, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 2022 - 2033, XP055558022 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2012.12.019 | [A] - GHARBARAN RAJENDRA ED - NIESVIZKY DR RUBEN, "Advances in the molecular functions of syndecan-1 (SDC1/CD138) in the pathogenesis of malignancies", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ONCOLOGY/HEMATOLOGY, (2014), vol. 94, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CRITREVONC.2014.12.003, ISSN 1040-8428, pages 1 - 17, XP029145291 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.critrevonc.2014.12.003 | [A] - JOOEUN BAE ET AL, "Novel epitope evoking CD138 antigen-specific cytotoxic T lymphocytes targeting multiple myeloma and other plasma cell disorders", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (20110901), doi:10.1111/j.1365-2141.2011.08850.x, ISSN 0007-1048, pages no - no, XP055007147 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2011.08850.x | [A] - TASSONE PIERFRANCESCO ET AL, "Cytotoxic activity of the maytansinoid immunoconjugate B-B4-DM1 against CD138+ multiple myeloma cells", BLOOD, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 104, no. 12, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2004-03-0963, ISSN 0006-4971, (20041201), pages 3688 - 3696, (20040803), XP002521112 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/BLOOD-2004-03-0963 | International search | [X] - TASSONE P. et al., "Cytotoxic activity of the maytansinoid immunoconjugate B-B4-DM1 against CD 138+ multiple myeloma cells.", Blood, (20041200), vol. 104, no. 12, pages 3688 - 3696, XP002521112 [X] 1-82 * Abstract, p.3688, right-hand column, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/BLOOD-2004-03-0963 | [A] - WIJDENES J. et al., "A plasmocyte selective monoclonal antibody (B-B4) recognizes syndecan-1.", British Journal of Haematology, (19960800), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 318 - 323, XP055527624 [A] 1-82 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2141.1996.d01-1811.x | [A] - DORE J.M. et al., "Identification and location on syndecan-1 core protein of the epitopes of B-B2 and B-B4 monoclonal antibodies.", FEBS Letters, (19980410), vol. 426, no. 1, pages 67 - 70, XP004262194 [A] 1-82 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(98)00310-X |