EP3617782 - OPTICAL MODULATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIM, Min Jun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
OH, Dong Hyun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
YOU, Jung Sun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LIM, Eun Jung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Jin Hong LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Hyun Jun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Nam Hun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18791018.7 | 30.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018KR05023 | Priority number, date | KR20170054964 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: KR 20170054964 | KR20180003785 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003785 | KR20180003784 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003784 | KR20180003783 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003783 | KR20180003786 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003786 | KR20180003787 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003787 | KR20180003788 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003788 | KR20180003789 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180003789 | KR20180004305 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: KR 20180004305 | [2020/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018199722 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617782 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3617782 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, G02F1/1333, G02F1/137, G02F1/139, G02F1/13, G02B27/01, G02F1/01, G02F1/1337, B32B27/06, B32B7/00, G02C7/10 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G02C7/101 (EP,US);
G02F1/1326 (KR,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,KR);
B32B7/00 (EP);
B32B7/035 (US);
G02B27/01 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (KR,US);
G02F1/0102 (KR);
G02F1/0126 (US);
G02F1/133305 (EP,US);
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
G02F1/133631 (US);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
G02F1/134309 (US);
G02F1/13475 (US);
G02F1/13725 (EP,US);
G02F1/13737 (US);
G02F1/1396 (EP,US);
G02F1/153 (US);
B32B2305/55 (KR);
B32B2307/4026 (KR);
G02B2027/0132 (KR);
G02B2027/0178 (KR,US);
G02B27/0176 (US);
G02C2202/16 (EP,US);
G02F1/133365 (US);
G02F1/133528 (US);
G02F1/133536 (EP,US);
G02F1/133635 (US);
G02F1/13439 (US);
G02F1/1347 (EP,US);
G02F2202/04 (KR,US);
G02F2413/01 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN MODULATION | [2020/10] | English: | OPTICAL MODULATION DEVICE | [2020/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MODULATION OPTIQUE | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2019 | Translation filed | 24.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2022 | 17.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | IE | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | LU | 30.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
IE | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 30.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4505546 (UMEDA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * columns 1-3,7-9; figures 4,5A,5B *; | [XI]US4586790 (UMEDA TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13 * column 4 - column 8; figures 3a,4,15 * [I] 14; | [A]US5608567 (GRUPP JOACHIM [CH]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, lines 20-25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2857870 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * | International search | [A]KR20080079564 (YANG JAE WOO [KR]) [A] 1-14 * . *; | [A]JP2010002664 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-14* . *; | [A]KR20140072032 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * . *; | [A]KR20150138680 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * . *; | [A]KR20160115428 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * . * | by applicant | EP0022311 | KR20170054964 | KR20180003783 | KR20180003784 | KR20180003785 | KR20180003786 | KR20180003787 | KR20180003788 | KR20180003789 | KR20180004305 | - D. PODOLSKYY et al., Liquid Crystals, (20080700), vol. 35, no. 7, pages 789 - 791 |