EP3615306 - SUPPORT STRUCTURES IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Divergent Technologies Inc. 19601 Hamilton Avenue Los Angeles, California 90502 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL NAGA, Eahab Nagi 21119 Lighthill Drive Topanga, California 90210 / US | 02 /
BUCKNELL, John Russell 701 Center Street El Segundo, California 90245 / US | 03 /
YAP, Chor Yen 1655 Begonia Way Gardena, California 90248 / US | 04 /
TENHOUTEN, Broc William 6501 Beachview Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90275 / US | 05 /
MARTINEZ, Antonio Bernerd 816 Maryland Street El Segundo, California 90245 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18791096.3 | 10.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US26944 | Priority number, date | US201715582409 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US201715582409 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200197 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615306 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C64/40, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
B29C64/40 (EP,CN,US);
B29C64/153 (CN,KR);
B22F10/00 (CN);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/43 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F10/60 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/66 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F3/003 (CN);
B22F3/02 (US);
B22F3/1017 (US);
B22F3/164 (US);
B22F3/18 (US);
B23K26/142 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23K26/702 (US);
B29C64/165 (KR);
B29C64/205 (KR);
B29C64/268 (KR);
B29C64/295 (KR);
B29C64/35 (KR);
B29C64/379 (KR);
B29C64/386 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,KR);
B33Y50/02 (US);
B33Y70/00 (KR);
B22F10/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/55 (EP,US);
B22F12/60 (EP,US);
B22F2202/01 (US);
B22F2202/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/28, B22F10/43, B22F10/60, B22F2202/05 (EP,US,KR,CN);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/60, B22F10/43, B22F2202/05 (EP,US,KR,CN);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/60, B22F10/43, B22F2202/06 (CN,EP,US,KR);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/66, B22F10/43, B22F2202/01 (US,KR,CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/10] | B29C64/218, B29C64/264, B29C64/141, B29C64/295, B33Y40/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | TRAGESTRUKTUREN IN DER GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2020/10] | English: | SUPPORT STRUCTURES IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2020/10] | French: | STRUCTURES DE SUPPORT UTILISÉES DANS LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE112014006475T (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 6-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0065] , [0092] , [0093] , [0099] , [0100] , [0133] - [0137] * * claims 1,3,4,10,12,1 ** figures 8-13 *; | [X] - Martin Erler ET AL, "Novel Machine and Measurement Concept for Micro Machining by Selective Laser Sintering Highspeed Lasersintering View project Projekt -LAURA View project", (20140831), URL: http://utw10945.utweb.utexas.edu/sites/default/files/2014-003-Erler.pdf, (20200702), XP055711346 [X] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document * * figures 2,3,5,9,12 * | [XY] - LOURDES D. BOBBIO ET AL, "Characterization of the strength of support structures used in powder bed fusion additive manufacturing of Ti-6Al-4V", ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING, NL, (20170119), vol. 14, doi:10.1016/j.addma.2017.01.002, ISSN 2214-8604, pages 60 - 68, XP055529054 [X] 1,5,9,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 6-8,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addma.2017.01.002 | International search | [A]US2004084814 (BOYD MELISSA D [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0038]; claims 1, 5; and figure 2B. *; | [X]US2017072467 (ZEHAVI RAANAN [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0140]; claim 1; and figures 1A, 4A-4D. *; | [X] - BOBBIO, LOURDES D. et al., "Characterization of the strength of support structures used in powder bed fusion additive manufacturing of Ti-6AI-4V", Additive Manufacturing, (20170119), vol. 14, pages 60 - 68, XP055529054 [X] 1-51 * See abstract; pages 61-67; table 1; and figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addma.2017.01.002 | [X] - LEFKY, CHRISTOPHER S. et al., "Dissolvable supports in powder bed fusion- printed stainless steel", 3D Printing and Additive Manufacturing, (20170301), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 3 - 11, XP055529056 [X] 1-51 * See abstract; pages 4-6; and figures 1, 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/3dp.2016.0043 | [A] - CALIGNANO, F., "Design optimization of supports for overhanging structures in aluminum and titanium alloys by selective laser melting", Materials & Design, (20141200), vol. 64, pages 203 - 213, XP029064731 [A] 1-51 * See abstract; and pages 204-213. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matdes.2014.07.043 |