|
27.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
03.08.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2019 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Request for a change to the title of the invention |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.11.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.11.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.11.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.11.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
18 |