Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11456500 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2022 | B2 | US2020067038 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | WO2018KR04356 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7062164B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2022 | B2 | JP2020513666 | 14.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | WO2018KR04356 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110050381B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2022 | B | CN110050381 | 23.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | WO2018KR04356 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3567669 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2020 | B1 | EP3567669 | 05.02.2020 | A4 | EP3567669 | 13.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | WO2018KR04356 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3567669T | 26.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | WO2018KR04356 | 13.04.2018 | EP18791497 | 13.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018199521 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102258174B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2021 | B1 | KR20180119990 | 05.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170053845 | 26.04.2017 |