EP3615521 - METHODS FOR IMPROVING MEMORY AND COGNITION AND FOR TREATING MEMORY AND COGNITIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavion, Inc. 600 East Water Street, Suite E Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARICICH, Yuri 977 Seminole Trail 357 Charlottesville VA 22901 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18791673.9 | 26.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US29616 | Priority number, date | US201762490377P | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762490377 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200850 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615521 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D413/14, A61K31/44, A61K31/4439, A61K45/06, A61P25/28, C07D207/08, C07D235/14, C07D239/82, C07D213/65 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C07D213/65 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/44 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4184 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4418 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL);
A61K31/554 (IL,KR);
A61K31/713 (IL,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D207/08 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D235/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D239/82 (EP,IL,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/10] | C07D401/06, C07D413/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES GEDÄCHTNISSES UND DER KOGNITION UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEDÄCHTNIS- UND KOGNITIVEN STÖRUNGEN | [2020/10] | English: | METHODS FOR IMPROVING MEMORY AND COGNITION AND FOR TREATING MEMORY AND COGNITIVE DISORDERS | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA MÉMOIRE ET DE LA COGNITION, ET DE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES DE LA MÉMOIRE ET DES TROUBLES COGNITIFS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006098969 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,21,22 * page 2, line 8 - line 13 * * page 14, line 23 - line 32 * * claims 1, 26,27 *; | [X]KR20090044924 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraph [0110] *; | [X]WO2009133128 (PHARNEXT [FR], et al) [X] 1-9,18,21,22 * claims 1, 18, 19 *; | [XI]US2010137403 (MALSTROM SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,18,21 * claims 1, 2, 11 * * claim 28 * [I] 10,12-17,19,20,22; | [XP]WO2017070680 (CAVION LLC [US]) [XP] 1-22 * claims 1-51 *; | [E]WO2019175395 (FISAHN ANDRE [SE], et al) [E] 1-22 * claims 1, 6 * * claim 18 *; | [A] - ZIXIU XIANG ET AL, "The Discovery and Characterization of ML218: A Novel, Centrally Active T-Type Calcium Channel Inhibitor with Robust Effects in STN Neurons and in a Rodent Model of Parkinson's Disease", ACS CHEMICAL NEUROSCIENCE, US, (20111028), vol. 2, no. 12, doi:10.1021/cn200090z, ISSN 1948-7193, pages 730 - 742, XP055761082 [A] 1-22 * compound 9; page 732; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cn200090z | International search | [A]US2010216841 (BARROW JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; entire document *; | [X]WO2012094615 (ZENYAKU KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * ; para [0001], [0018], [0088]-[0089] *; | [A]US8586619 (WU JAY JIE-QIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; entire document *; | [PX]WO2017070680 (CAVION LLC [US]) [PX] 1-3* ; entire document * |