EP3697384 - PREPARATION AND STORAGE OF LIPOSOMAL RNA FORMULATIONS SUITABLE FOR THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioNTech SE An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2021/52] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states BioNTech RNA Pharmaceuticals GmbH An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Heinrich c/o BioNTech AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | 02 /
HÖRNER, Sebastian c/o BioNTech AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | 03 /
ESPARZA BORQUEZ, Isaac Hernan c/o BioNTech AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | 04 /
HILLER, Thomas Michael c/o BioNTech AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | 05 /
BATES, Ferdia c/o BioNTech AG An der Goldgrube 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18792901.3 | 18.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP78587 | Priority number, date | US201762574965P | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762574965 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077053 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697384 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K31/713 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,IL);
A61K47/16 (CN);
A61K47/24 (CN);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR);
A61K47/28 (CN);
A61K48/00 (KR,US);
A61K48/0008 (CN);
A61K48/0075 (CN,KR);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K9/08 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | 19.05.2020 | ME | 19.05.2020 | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG UND LAGERUNG VON LIPOSOMALEN RNA-FORMULIERUNGEN FÜR DIE THERAPIE | [2020/35] | English: | PREPARATION AND STORAGE OF LIPOSOMAL RNA FORMULATIONS SUITABLE FOR THERAPY | [2020/35] | French: | PRÉPARATION ET STOCKAGE DE FORMULATIONS D'ARN LIPOSOMAL APPROPRIÉES POUR UNE THÉRAPIE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 19.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Divisional application(s) | EP21151194.4 / EP3858333 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013143555 (BIONTECH AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2016045732 (BIONTECH RNA PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO2016156398 (BIONTECH RNA PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2010027827 | WO2011066342 |