EP3700714 - A TORQUE WRENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torque Technologies Ltd. t/a BMS Ireland Technology Centre Annacotty Business Park Limerick V94 Y06D / IE | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Dara Ballyneety Co. Limerick / IE | 02 /
BENN, Robert Creagh Street Glin Co. Limerick / IE | 03 /
O'REGAN, James Bohergeela Meanus Co. Limerick / IE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18792911.2 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018EP78735 | Priority number, date | IE2017S000229 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: IE S20170229 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019081372 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700714 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/06, B25B23/00, B25B23/142 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B25B23/0028 (EP,US);
B25B23/1425 (EP,US);
B25B23/1415 (US);
B25B23/1427 (EP,US);
B25G1/043 (EP,US);
B25G1/063 (US);
B25G1/066 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTSCHLÜSSEL | [2020/36] | English: | A TORQUE WRENCH | [2020/36] | French: | CLÉ DYNAMOMÉTRIQUE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 24.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007221015 (HSIEH CHIH-CHING [TW]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0018]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2008134800 (ESCOE T KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0037] - [0042]; figures 2,5,7 *; | [A]US7562589 (ANJANAPPA MUNISWAMAPPA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 24; figures 2,4,5,6 *; | [A]US2009320653 (COFFLAND DONALD W [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0048] - [0060]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB2470228 (CRANE ELECTRONICS [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 15 - page 7, line 19; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2011185861 (HU BOBBY [TW]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036]; figures 3-10 *; | [A]US8171828 (DUVAN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2014165796 (GAUTHIER MICHAEL T [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,10,12 * paragraphs [0124] - [0150]; figures 12,13,17,18,19 *; | [Y]US2016288304 (SHIAO HSUAN-SEN [TW]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0024] - [0038]; figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [XYI]JP3212015U (HU B) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0030] - [0049]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 3-5,8-10 [I] 11 |