EP3698236 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY MANAGING A PLURALITY OF DESIGNATION PERIPHERALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immersion 3 Rue Raymond Lavigne 33100 Bordeaux / FR | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTET, Julien 36 rue Marcel Bouc 33130 Begles / FR | 02 /
SEMELLE, Loic 6 rue Frédéric Chopin 33450 Saint Loubes / FR | 03 /
KERVEGANT, Cédric 105 Avenue Aristide Briand 33700 Merignac / FR | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18793394.0 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP78792 | Priority number, date | FR20170059852 | 19.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1759852 | [2020/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077142 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698236 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698236 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G06F3/023, G06F3/038, G06F3/033 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/023 (EP);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G06F13/4282 (US);
G06F3/033 (EP);
G06F3/03545 (US);
G06F3/038 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | G06F3/023, G06F3/033, G06F3/038 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 24.03.2020 | TN | 24.03.2020 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN VERWALTUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON DESIGNATIONSPERIPHERIEGERÄTEN | [2020/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY MANAGING A PLURALITY OF DESIGNATION PERIPHERALS | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA GESTION SIMULTANÉE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE PÉRIPHÉRIQUES DE DÉSIGNATION | [2022/30] |
Former [2020/35] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA GESTION SIMULTANEE D'UNE PLURALITE DE PERIPHERIQUES DE DESIGNATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 24.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2020 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Observations by third parties | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Observations by third parties | 13.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | AT | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
AT | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2009319099 (CORBEFIN JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 32] , [0 35] - [0040] *[A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15; | [XA]DE102013202818 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0012] , [0032] - [0034]; figure 1 * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15; | [XA] - Anonymous, "KVM Splitter - Wikipedia", (20151224), last edited on 24 December 2015, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/KVM_Splitter, (20180209), XP055449691 [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15 | [XA] - Anonymous, "NTI VOPEX Touch Screen Sharer NTI VOPEX-4MM-BI Touch Screen Sharer", (20151231), Copyright © 2015, URL: http://archive.42u.com/nti-touch-screen-splitter.htm, (20180209), XP055449698 [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15 | [XA] - Anonymous, "Serial Touch Screen KVM Splitters and Multiplexers for 4 Workstations from Vetra, VIP-884-KMV-TS", (20031231), Copyright © 1995 - 2003, URL: http://www.vetra.com/884TStext.html, (20180209), XP055449701 [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15 | [XA] - Anonymous, "Two Workstation Touch Monitor KVM Splitter-Multiplexer with Extension", (20011231), Copyright © 1995-2001, URL: http://www.vetra.com/382TStext.html, (20180209), XP055449702 [X] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12,15 | Examination | CN102314253 | US2012038561 | DE102014206745 | other | CN102314253 | US2012038561 | DE102014206745 | FR3072803 | US7557774 |