EP3689036 - CELL SELECTION BASED ON USER CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yuhua c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
SUAREZ, Alberto c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Smith, Jeremy, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18793713.1 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP35414 | Priority number, date | GB20170015921 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: GB 201715921 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019065618 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689036 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, H04W48/12 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (GB);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (GB);
H04W84/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | ZELLAUSWAHL AUF BASIS DER BENUTZERFÄHIGKEIT | [2020/32] | English: | CELL SELECTION BASED ON USER CAPABILITY | [2020/32] | French: | SÉLECTION DE CELLULE FONDÉE SUR UNE CAPACITÉ D'UTILISATEUR | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 17.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014179987 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0073] - [0087] *; | [Y]EP3136782 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0020]; figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0096] - [0098] * * paragraphs [0107] - [0111] *; | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on the PRACH for SUL", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715716, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051339178 [Y] 1-15 * pages 1-3 * | [XP] - INTERDIGITAL INC, "SUL Impact on Cell Selection and Reselection Criteria", vol. RAN WG2, no. Sanya, China; 20180416 - 20180420, (20180414), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1804813 (R15 NR WI AI10452 SUL IMPACT ON CELL SELECTION RESELECTION CRITERIA), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20180414), XP051428520 [XP] 1-15 * pages 1-3 * |