Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11251929 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | B2 | US2020067688 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314158 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN83233 | 16.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3567960 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | B1 | EP3567960 | 15.01.2020 | A4 | EP3567960 | 13.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314158 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN83233 | 16.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018201886 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314158 | 05.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108811132B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2020 | B | CN108811132 | 13.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710314158 | 05.05.2017 |