16.02.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
21.11.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.12.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.12.2022 |
First examination report |
|
29.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
23.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
05.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
06.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
10.07.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
15.11.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
09.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.09.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
13.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|