Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018201893 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN83102 | 04.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10945227 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2020163036 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN83534 | 18.04.2018 | WO2017CN83102 | 04.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110622584B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2021 | B | CN110622584 | 27.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN83534 | 18.04.2018 | WO2017CN83102 | 04.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3580969 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2021 | A4 | EP3580969 | 18.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN83534 | 18.04.2018 | WO2017CN83102 | 04.05.2017 |