Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11304097 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | B2 | US2020068444 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314156 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN85501 | 03.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3567916 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B1 | EP3567916 | 22.01.2020 | A4 | EP3567916 | 13.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314156 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN85501 | 03.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018202095 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710314156 | 05.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108811130B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2021 | B | CN108811130 | 13.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710314156 | 05.05.2017 |