Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11399332 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2020162996 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN84677 | 26.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3902331 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | EP18794523 | 26.04.2018 | WO2018CN84677 | 26.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118118973 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | CN202410469966 | 05.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3621320 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2023 | B1 | EP3621320 | 07.04.2021 | A4 | EP3621320 | 11.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | WO2018CN84677 | 26.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018201970 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108811034 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710313873 | 05.05.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP3902331 |