EP3618625 - SYNERGISTIC MIXTURES FOR FUNGAL CONTROL IN VEGETABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corteva Agriscience LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2021/52] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Chenglin 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | 02 /
MATHIESON, John, T. 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, IN 46268 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18794937.5 | 02.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US30560 | Priority number, date | US201762500186P | 02.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762500186 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204437 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618625 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3618625 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54, A01N43/653, C07C229/08, A01P3/00, A01N43/40 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A01N37/18 (RU);
A01N37/34 (IL,KR);
A01N43/54 (IL,KR,RU);
A01N43/56 (IL,KR);
A01N43/653 (IL,KR,RU);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N37/34, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N47/14, A01N47/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | A01N43/54, A01N43/653, C07C229/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE MISCHUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PILZBEFALL BEI GEMÜSE | [2020/11] | English: | SYNERGISTIC MIXTURES FOR FUNGAL CONTROL IN VEGETABLES | [2020/11] | French: | MÉLANGES SYNERGIQUES POUR LA LUTTE CONTRE DES CHAMPIGNONS DANS DES LÉGUMES | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 04.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22157915.4 / EP4066641 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | MT | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | LU | 02.05.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
LU | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | SM | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | SM | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011082160 (OWEN W JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * tables 1-12 *; | [A]US2014187587 (OUIMETTE DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * table 1 *; | [A]WO2016109257 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0039]; compound 145 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS ED - DARL KUHN, "Synergistic Fungicidal Compositions of Heterocyclic Aromatic Amides and Triazoles", IP.COM, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20040720), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013020905 [A] 1-11 * tables 1-5 * | International search | [Y]TW150127B (BASF SE) [Y] 1, 15, 17, 18/1, 18/15, 18/17, 19/1, 19/15, 19/17* , English translation; page 16, paragraph 6 *; | [Y]EP0002940 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1, 15-16, 18/1, 18/15-16, 19/1, 19/15-16 * ; page 3, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]US5476868 (WINGERT HORST [DE], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5, 18/1-2, 18/5, 19/1-2, 19/5 * ; column 8, lines 1-5; claim 1 *; | [Y]US8883811 (OWEN W JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 10, 14, 18/1-4, 18/10, 18/14, 19/1-4, 19/10, 19/14 * ; abstract; column 3, lines 40-50; column 4, lines 1-25; column 12, lines 1-25 *; | [Y]US2015181874 (OWEN W JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1, 6-13, 18/1, 18/6-13, 19/1, 19/6-13 * ; paragraphs [0050]-[0052], [0054], [0062]-[0063], [0075], [0114] *; | [Y]WO2016122802 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [Y] 1-17, 18/1-17, 19/1-17 * ; paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0031], [0039]-[0040], [0046], [00105], [00107], [00126]; claim 29 * | by applicant | - COLBY, S. R., "Calculation of the synergistic and antagonistic response of herbicide combinations", Weeds, (19670000), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22 |