EP3618674 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTONOMOUS MOBILE FOOD PREPARATION AND DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nixon, Timothy James 2768 Amaranda Ct. Naples, FL 34114 / US | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states Nixon, Timothy James 63645 Monticello W. Washington, MI 48095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18795208.0 | 30.04.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US30293 | Priority number, date | US201715586458 | 04.05.2017 Original published format: US201715586458 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204283 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618674 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47J39/02, A47B31/02, B60P3/025, G06Q10/08, G08G1/00 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G08G1/202 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (US);
B60P3/0257 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | A47J39/02, A47B31/02, B60P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUTONOME MOBILE NAHRUNGSMITTELZUBEREITUNG UND LIEFERUNG | [2020/11] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTONOMOUS MOBILE FOOD PREPARATION AND DELIVERY | [2020/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET DE LIVRAISON AUTONOMES ET MOBILES D'ALIMENTS | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 15.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]PT104113 (INST SUPERIOR TECNICO [PT], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0033] , [0050]; claim - *; | [Y]US2014370167 (GARDEN ALEXANDER JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0011] - [0013] - [0017] , [0021] , [0028] , [0039] - [0044] - [0050] , [0063] - [0065]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US2015006005 (YU STEVEN SOUNYOUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0091] , [0151] , [0159] , [0176] - [0178] * | International search | [Y]PT104113 (INST SUPERIOR TECNICO [PT], et al) [Y] 1-20 * ; see machine translation. *; | [Y]CN102328791 (NXP BV) [Y] 5, 9, 14* ; see machine translation. *; | [Y]US2016162833 (GARDEN ALEXANDER JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-20 * ; figure 2A-2C; paragraphs [0004], [0028], [0042]-[0044], [0097]. * |