EP3707255 - COATINGS OF ENZYME PARTICLES COMPRISING ORGANIC WHITE PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENGE, Ullrich Köchlinstraße 1 9001 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Stefan Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18795579.4 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP79636 | Priority number, date | EP20170200746 | 09.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17200746 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019091822 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707255 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/98, C11D3/386, C11D3/40, C11D3/37, A23K40/30, A23K20/179, A23K20/189, A23P10/30, A23L29/00, A23L5/47 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C11D3/38672 (EP,US);
C12N9/98 (EP,US);
A23K20/179 (EP,US);
A23K20/189 (EP,US);
A23K40/30 (EP);
A23L29/06 (EP,US);
A23L5/47 (EP,US);
A23P10/30 (EP);
C08L25/06 (US);
C08L71/02 (US);
C11D3/3726 (EP);
C11D3/3749 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGEN VON ENZYMPARTIKELN MIT ORGANISCHEN WEISSPIGMENTEN | [2020/38] | English: | COATINGS OF ENZYME PARTICLES COMPRISING ORGANIC WHITE PIGMENTS | [2020/38] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS DE PARTICULES ENZYMATIQUES COMPRENANT DES PIGMENTS ORGANIQUES BLANCS | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 09.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/21] | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6248706 (HERRMANN HUBERT A [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* column 6, line 28 - line 50; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US6673763 (HANSEN OLE REGNAR [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 18, lines 4-44; examples 6, 8, 10 *; | [A]DE102005033516 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002]; claim - *; | [A]US2016177240 (BOLLINGER MARK [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] , [0 10]; claim 1 * | by applicant | GB1296839 | GB1372034 | DE2501123 | US4016040 | US4106991 | US4435307 | EP0170360 | EP0218272 | US4713245 | EP0258068 | EP0260105 | EP0304332 | EP0304331 | EP0305216 | JPS6474992 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | WO9009440 | WO9009428 | JPH02238885 | EP0407225 | WO9105053 | WO9116422 | WO9201046 | WO9205249 | EP0495257 | WO9216634 | WO9219729 | EP0531372 | EP0531315 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9402597 | WO9407998 | WO9418314 | WO9425583 | WO9425578 | WO9506720 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9524471 | US5457046 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9611262 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9623873 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | WO9723606 | US5648263 | WO9739116 | US5686593 | WO9743424 | US5691178 | WO9808940 | WO9812307 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | US5763254 | US5776757 | WO9834946 | WO9927083 | WO9927084 | WO9964619 | WO0040689 | US6124127 | US2001009929 | WO0206442 | WO02092741 | WO03095638 | WO2011048046 | WO2011085747 | WO2012080201 | US2012245240 | WO2012143862 | DE102011118032 | WO2013060621 | DE102012215642 | WO2015024882 | WO2015024835 | WO2015028567 | - J. BRANDRUP; E. H. IMMERGUT, Polymer Handbook | - KARGER, Annalen der Physik, (19710000), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 107 - 109 | - STEIJSKAL; TANNER, J. Chem. Phys., (19650000), vol. 42, page 288ff | - "Particle size enlargement", C. E. CAPES, Handbook of Powder Technology, Elsevier, (19800000), vol. 1 | - "Surfactant Science Series", Powdered detergents, Marcel Dekker, (19980000), vol. 71, pages 140 - 142 | - DARTOIS et al., Biochemica et Biophysica Acta, (19930000), vol. 1131, pages 253 - 360 | WO1998DK00299 |