|
05.06.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
30 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
94 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
29 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2023 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
08.08.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.06.2023 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2023 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
53 |
|
03.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
58 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
42 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2022 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
24 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |