Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11998021 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2024 | B2 | US2021037837 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3089532 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | C | CA3089532 | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3713755 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3713755 | 30.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020015329 | 08.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3713755T | 08.08.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2925543T | 18.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3713755T | 20.03.2023 | T4 | PL3713755T | 20.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2020126911 | 28.02.2022 | A3 | RU2020126911 | 28.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | WO2018EP79679 | 30.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019149397 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018101985 | 27.09.2018 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202018106192U | 07.11.2018 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE059288T | 28.11.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3713755T | 12.08.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102018101985 | 30.01.2018 |