EP3797520 - TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICES FOR RELIABLE RECEPTION OF CONTROL MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEROTTI, Alberto Giuseppe Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 16440 Kista / SE | 02 /
POPOVIC, Branislav, M. Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 16440 Kista / SE | 03 /
SCHIER, Thorsten Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 16440 Kista / SE | 04 /
ROBERT SAFAVI, Anahid Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 16440 Kista / SE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18796030.7 | 31.10.2018 | [2021/13] | WO2018EP79812 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020088751 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797520 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2383, H04L1/00, H04L1/20, H03M13/09, H03M13/29, H03M13/00, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W72/12 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/2383 (EP);
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H03M13/09 (EP);
H03M13/091 (EP);
H03M13/6525 (EP);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H03M13/2906 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | SENDE- UND EMPFANGSEINRICHTUNGEN FÜR DEN SICHEREN EMPFANG VON STEUERNACHRICHTEN | [2021/13] | English: | TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DEVICES FOR RELIABLE RECEPTION OF CONTROL MESSAGES | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION POUR UNE RÉCEPTION FIABLE DE MESSAGES DE COMMANDE | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 22.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011246865 (WEN XUE [CN]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2013148623 (NISHIO AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0192] ** paragraph [0193] - paragraph [0195] *; | [XI]US2017366199 (GE YIQUN [CA], et al) [X] 1,13,17-19 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0274] - paragraph [0281] * * figures 16,18, 29-31 * [I] 2-12,14-16; | [A]US2018131474 (BERGGREN FREDRIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0138] * * figure 2 *; | [XI]WO2018143772 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,13,17-19 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * [I] 2-12,14-16 |