EP3713936 - SUBSTITUTED TRIFLUOROMETHYLOXADIAZOLES FOR COMBATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEBE, Christine Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
GRAMMENOS, Wassilios Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
TERTERYAN-SEISER, Violeta Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
QUINTERO PALOMAR, Maria Angelica Speyerer Straße 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
FEHR, Marcus Speyerer Straße 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 06 /
MENTZEL, Tobias Speyerer Straße 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
CRAIG, Ian Robert Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
RUDOLF, Georg Christoph Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 09 /
GROTE, Thomas Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 10 /
WINTER, Christian Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
ESCRIBANO CUESTA, Ana Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 12 /
LOHMANN, Jan Klaas Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 13 /
SEET, Michael Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 14 /
MUELLER, Bernd Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18796061.2 | 07.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP80388 | Priority number, date | EP20170203288 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17203288 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101511 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713936 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713936 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, A01N43/82, A61P3/00 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (US);
C07D413/12 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/82, A01N2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE TRIFLUORMETHYLOXADIAZOLE ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG PHYTOPATHOGENER PILZE | [2020/40] | English: | SUBSTITUTED TRIFLUOROMETHYLOXADIAZOLES FOR COMBATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI | [2020/40] | French: | TRIFLUOROMÉTHYL-OXADIAZOLES SUBSTITUÉS POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES CHAMPIGNONS PHYTOPATHOGÈNES | [2021/23] |
Former [2020/40] | TRIFLUOROMÉTHYLOXADIAZOLES SUBSTITUÉS PERMETTANT DE LUTTER CONTRE DES CHAMPIGNONS PHYTOPATHOGÈNES | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2018 | AL | 20.10.2021 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | IE | 07.11.2021 | LU | 07.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | CH | 01.07.2022 | LI | 01.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
CH | 01.07.2022 | ||
LI | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
CH | 01.07.2022 | ||
LI | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 20.10.2021 | ||
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017118689 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * example - ** claim - *; | [AD]WO2017162868 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | US3296272 | US3325503 | EP0141317 | EP0152031 | EP0226917 | EP0243970 | EP0256503 | EP0428941 | EP0532022 | WO9401546 | DE19650197 | WO9844140 | WO9846608 | WO9914187 | WO9924413 | WO9927783 | WO0026345 | WO0026356 | WO0029404 | WO0046148 | EP1028125 | EP1035122 | WO0065913 | WO0131042 | WO0141558 | DE10021412 | WO0154501 | EP1122244 | WO0156358 | CN1309897 | WO0222583 | WO0234946 | EP1201648 | WO0236831 | WO0240431 | US2002102582 | JP2002316902 | WO02100163 | WO03010149 | WO03011853 | WO03013224 | WO03014103 | WO03016286 | WO03016303 | US2003126634 | WO03053145 | WO03061388 | WO03066609 | WO03074491 | CN1456054 | WO2004011601 | WO2004039986 | WO2004049804 | WO2004072235 | WO2004074492 | WO2004083193 | WO2004099447 | WO2005059103 | WO2005061720 | WO2005063721 | WO2005087772 | WO2005087773 | WO2005103266 | WO2005103301 | WO2005120234 | WO2005123689 | WO2005123690 | WO2006013104 | WO2006015866 | WO2006039376 | WO2006087325 | WO2006087343 | DE102005009458 | WO2006098952 | WO2006108674 | WO2006108675 | WO2006128573 | WO2006130436 | WO2007006670 | CN1907024 | WO2007017186 | WO2007082098 | WO2007090624 | WO2007129454 | WO2007140256 | WO2007142840 | US2007292854 | WO2008002872 | WO2008013622 | WO2008054747 | EP1932843 | WO2008112019 | WO2008122406 | WO2008151780 | WO2009064652 | WO2009074950 | WO2009090181 | WO2009094442 | WO2009103049 | WO2009102873 | WO2009111263 | WO2010037016 | WO2010069882 | WO2010077816 | WO2010080829 | WO2010139271 | WO2011022469 | WO2011028657 | WO2011034704 | WO2011062904 | WO2011066384 | WO2011077514 | WO2011081174 | WO2011084621 | WO2011135833 | WO2011135827 | WO2011153186 | WO2012051199 | WO2012082548 | WO2012084812 | WO2012134808 | WO2012165511 | WO2012168188 | WO2013003558 | WO2013008162 | WO2013007767 | WO2013010862 | WO2013016527 | WO2013016516 | WO2013024009 | WO2013024010 | WO2013047749 | WO2013047441 | WO2013053690 | WO2013092224 | WO2013112527 | WO2013116251 | WO2013127704 | WO2013162072 | CN103387541 | WO2013169923 | WO2014060177 | WO2014116854 | WO2014178910 | WO2014178913 | WO2014178941 | WO2014179276 | WO2014201235 | WO2015053998 | EP2865265 | WO2015065922 | JP2015089883 | WO2015095767 | JP2015120675 | WO2015119246 | WO2015142571 | WO2016183445 | WO2017062831 | WO2017062825 | WO2017118689 | WO2017162868 | - Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 15, pages 4550 - 4554 | - Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20160000), vol. 138, no. 16, pages 5230 - 5233 | - European Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20080000), vol. 16, pages 2767 - 2773 | - Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 72, no. 5, pages 1737 - 1741 | - Organic Letters, (20100000), vol. 12, no. 17, pages 3772 - 3775 | - MCCUTCHEON'S, Emulsifiers & Detergents, McCutcheon's Directories, (20080000), vol. 1 | - Can. J. Plant Sci., (19680000), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 587 - 94 |