EP3694853 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 6-(2-HYDROXY-2-METHYLPROPOXY)-4-(6-(6-((6-METHOXYPYRIDIN-3-YL)METHYL)-3,6-DIAZABICYCLO[3.1.1]HEPTAN-3-YL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDINE-3-CARBONITRILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | For all designated states Loxo Oncology, Inc. Lilly Corporate Centre Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | [2023/20] |
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Waltnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | ||
For all designated states Loxo Oncology, Inc. Lilly Corporate Centre Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARY, Charles Todd 4214 DaVinci Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 02 /
SPENCER, Stacey c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 03 /
CRANE, Zack 2620 Trade Centre Ave. Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 04 /
CHANDO, Katelyn 2620 Trade Centre Ave. Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 05 /
ASSELIN, Sylvie 2620 Trade Centre Ave. Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 06 /
LIU, Weidong 2620 Trade Centre Ave. Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 07 /
WELCH, Mike 2620 Trade Centre Ave. Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 08 /
COOK, Adam c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 09 /
KOLAKOWSKI, Gabrielle R. c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 10 /
METCALF, Andrew T. c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 11 /
MORENO, David A. c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 12 /
TANG, Tony P. c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Smith, Andrew George Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [2023/20] |
Former [2020/34] | Smith, Andrew George Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18796238.6 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US55255 | Priority number, date | US201762570565P | 10.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570565 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019075092 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694853 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3694853 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D519/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 6-(2-HYDROXY-2-METHYLPROPOXY)-4-(6-(6-((6-METHOXYPYRIDIN-3-YL)METHYL)-3,6-DIAZABICYCLO[3.1.1]HEPTAN-3-YL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDIN-3-CARBONITRIL | [2020/34] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 6-(2-HYDROXY-2-METHYLPROPOXY)-4-(6-(6-((6-METHOXYPYRIDIN-3-YL)METHYL)-3,6-DIAZABICYCLO[3.1.1]HEPTAN-3-YL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDINE-3-CARBONITRILE | [2020/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 6-(2-HYDROXY-2-MÉTHYLPROPOXY)-4-(6-(6-((6-MÉTHOXYPYRIDIN-3-YL)MÉTHYL)-3,6-DIAZABICYCLO[3.1.1]HEPTAN-3-YL)PYRIDIN-3-YL)PYRAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIDINE-3-CARBONITRILE | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | MC | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | LU | 10.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
LU | 10.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
LU | 10.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
MC | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 18.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012277247 (MENET CHRISTEL JEANNE MARIE [BE], et al) [A] 1-109* example - *; | [AD]WO2017011776 (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [AD] 1-109 * example -; claim - *; | [XPI]WO2018071447 (ANDREWS STEVEN W [US], et al) [XP] 1,107,109 * example - * [I] 1-109 | by applicant | WO2017011776 | US2017096425 | - G. D. FASSMAN, Handbook of Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, CRC Press, (19760000), vol. 1, pages 305 - 347 | - The Peptides: Analysis, Synthesis, Biology, Academic Press, (19810000), vol. 3 | - The Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, American Pharmaceutical Association | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, vol. 1-3 | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Parenteral Medications, vol. 1-2 | - Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Disperse Systems, Marcel Dekker, Inc., vol. 1-2 |