EP3684483 - CALIBRATION BIAS FOR CONTROL MECHANISMS IN USER INPUT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Ross Anthony MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Aaron MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MCCLIVE, Curtis F. MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Townsend, Martyn Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2020/31] | Townsend, Martyn Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18796315.2 | 13.10.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018US55762 | Priority number, date | US201715793614 | 25.10.2017 Original published format: US201715793614 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019083749 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684483 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3684483 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/22, G05G9/047, G06F3/0338, G06F3/038 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A63F13/22 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/211 (US);
A63F13/23 (US);
A63F13/235 (US);
A63F13/24 (CN,US);
A63F13/42 (US);
A63F13/428 (US);
A63F13/92 (US);
G05G9/047 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0346 (US);
G06F3/038 (US);
G06F3/0383 (EP,CN,US);
A63F2009/2447 (US);
A63F2300/105 (US);
A63F2300/6045 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERBIAS FÜR STEUERMECHANISMEN VON EINGABEGERÄTEN | [2022/04] | English: | CALIBRATION BIAS FOR CONTROL MECHANISMS IN USER INPUT DEVICES | [2020/31] | French: | BIAIS D'ÉTALONNAGE POUR MÉCHANISME DE COMMANDE DANS APPAREILS D'ENTRÉE | [2022/04] |
Former [2020/31] | KALIBRIERUNGSBIAS FÜR STEUERUNGSMECHANISMEN IN BENUTZEREINGABEVORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/31] | ERREUR SYSTÉMATIQUE D'ÉTALONNAGE POUR DES MÉCANISMES DE COMMANDE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS D'ENTRÉE UTILISATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 23.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6086236 (DE RAAD GEURT B [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 6 *; | [A]US2008154533 (POULSEN KNUD [DK]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040]; figure 5 *; | [XI]US2017255279 (MCCLIVE CURTIS F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0 39] - [0043] - [0 47] - [0051] - [0 65] - [0067] - [0 90] * [I] 3,10 |