EP3697498 - RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muir IP Ltd The Granary The Glen Kinsale, County Cork P17 YX24 / IE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Kevin 645 chemin Font de Cuberte F-06560 Valbonne / FR | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18796380.6 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP78772 | Priority number, date | GB20170017238 | 20.10.2017 Original published format: GB 201717238 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077135 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697498 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, G21K5/10 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61N5/1079 (EP,US);
A61N5/1082 (EP,GB,US);
A61N5/1067 (US);
A61B6/0407 (US);
A61B6/0487 (GB);
A61N5/1048 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | STRAHLENTHERAPIESYSTEM | [2020/35] | English: | RADIATION THERAPY SYSTEM | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RADIOTHÈRAPIE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5321271 (SCHONBERG RUSSELL G [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013033249 (ROSA LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2013066134 (CAROL MARK [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9-15,20-27 * paragraphs [0021] , [0046] , [0047] , [0056] - [0058]; figures 1-3; claims 1-25 * [A] 2-4,6,30 [I] 8,16-19,28; | [A]WO2014132502 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-30* the whole document * |