EP3672556 - INFLATABLE SURGICAL SUPPORT ACCESSORY HAVING SINGLE FAULT TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maquet GmbH Kehler Straße 31 76437 Rastatt / DE | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIONTEK, Manfred Kreuzelbergstrasse 22 76189 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
HUND, Siegfried Königsgasse 6 77704 Oberkirch / DE | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18796425.9 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018EP79756 | Priority number, date | DE201710125485 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017125485 | [2020/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019086484 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672556 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/12 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61G13/123 (EP,KR,US);
A61G13/1265 (EP,KR,US);
A61G13/129 (KR);
A61G2200/32 (KR);
A61G2203/10 (KR);
A61G2203/70 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARES CHIRURGISCHES LAGERUNGSZUBEHÖR MIT EINFEHLERSICHERHEIT | [2020/27] | English: | INFLATABLE SURGICAL SUPPORT ACCESSORY HAVING SINGLE FAULT TOLERANCE | [2020/27] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE SUPPORT GONFLABLE CHIRURGICAL À SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRÉE | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5613254 (CLAYMAN RALPH V [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 21 - column 9, line 25; figures 1, 6, 7-9 *; | [XAI]CN203841967U (QINGDAO MUNICIPAL HOSPITAL) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 3,11,15 [I] 9,12; | [A]CN204274906U (DUAN HAILING) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017064183 (PEARL TECH AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 20 - page 21, line 2; figures 1-13 *; | [XI]CN107224380 (JIANGSU HAIZE MEDICAL TECH DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1,7-10,14 * the whole document * [I] 12,13 | by applicant | DE314727 | DE377767 | AT137152B | DE759394 | DE2103499 | US2010089411 | DE202017002188U |