EP3710224 - PLASTICATING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EREMA Engineering Recycling Maschinen und Anlagen Gesellschaft m.b.H. Freindorf Unterfeldstrasse 3 4052 Ansfelden / AT | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIETHLINGER, Jürgen Schwarzmoos 32 4851 Gampern / AT | 02 /
LUGER, Hans Jürgen Stockhofstraße 43 4020 Linz / AT | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18796820.1 | 23.10.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018AT50020 | Priority number, date | AT20170050961 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: AT 509612017 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019094996 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710224 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710224 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/62, B29C48/67, B29C48/53, B29C48/65 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
B29C48/67 (EP,US);
B29C48/62 (EP,US);
B29C45/60 (AT,US);
B29C48/53 (EP,US);
B29C48/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASTIFIZIERSCHNECKE | [2020/39] | English: | PLASTICATING SCREW | [2020/39] | French: | VIS SANS FIN DE MALAXAGE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 06.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/48] | EE | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2224283 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE2362806 (KRUPP GMBH) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 * * figures 1-2 *; | [X]JPS61158417U (N.N.) [X] 1,2 * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US4840492 (NAKAMURA KENSAKU [JP]) [X] 1,2* figure 4 *; | [X]JP2001062897 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * figures 2-3 *; | [X]CN101428468 (UNIV HENAN POLYTECHNIC [CN]) [X] 1,4,5 * figure 1 * |