13.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
21.12.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
14.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
21.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
19.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
22.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|