Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11419841 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2022 | B2 | US2020360334 | 19.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306560 | 10.11.2017 | WO2018EP80915 | 12.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111918648 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17306560 | 10.11.2017 | WO2018EP80915 | 12.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3706732 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306560 | 10.11.2017 | WO2018EP80915 | 12.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019092239 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306560 | 10.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3482758 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306560 | 10.11.2017 |