EP3703858 - DEHYDROGENATION CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Corporation 1600 West Hill Street Louisville, Kentucky 40210 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XING, Rong 4008 Whiteblossom Estates Court Louisville, Kentucky 40241 / US | 02 /
FRIDMAN, Vladimir 418 Glensford Drive Louisville, Kentucky 40245 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Kuba, Stefan, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH IPM / Patent & License Management Arabellastraße 4a 81925 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18797215.3 | 04.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US54283 | Priority number, date | US201762578677P | 30.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762578677 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089176 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703858 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/08, B01J23/08, B01J23/62, B01J23/63, C07C5/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B01J23/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B01J21/04 (EA,US);
B01J23/62 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B01J21/08 (EA,US);
B01J23/002 (EA,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,EA,KR,US);
B01J37/0201 (EA,KR,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07C5/00 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07C5/322 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07C5/3332 (EA,US);
C07C5/3337 (EA,US);
B01J2523/13 (EA,US);
B01J2523/32 (EA,US);
B01J2523/47 (EA,US);
B01J2523/48 (EA,US);
B01J2523/828 (EA,US);
C07C11/09 (EA,US);
C07C2521/06 (EA,US);
C07C2523/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07C2523/62 (EA,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/322, C07C11/06 (EP,US);
C07C5/322, C07C11/09 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | DEHYDRIERUNGSKATALYSATOREN | [2020/37] | English: | DEHYDROGENATION CATALYSTS | [2020/37] | French: | CATALYSEURS DE DÉSHYDROGÉNATION | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1074299 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 10] , [0 13] - [0016] - [0 19] - [0022] - [0 26] * * table 1 * * example 2 * * claims 1-5 *[I] 13 |