EP3622606 - POWER SYSTEMS WITH INVERTER INPUT VOLTAGE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2021/50] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Xiaolin 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
DAI, Heping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Huibin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
FU, Dianbo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
MAO, Xiaolin 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
DAI, Heping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHU, Huibin 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | |||
04 /
FU, Dianbo 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | |||
Former [2020/12] | 01 /
MAO, Xiaolin 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
DAI, Heping 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | |||
03 /
ZHU, Huibin 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | |||
04 /
FU, Dianbo 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano, TX 75024 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18797622.0 | 14.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018CN86663 | Priority number, date | US201715594231 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: US201715594231 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018206010 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3622606 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, // H02J1/10, H02J13/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
H02J13/00022 (EP,US);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J3/388 (US);
H02J7/02 (US);
H02J1/10 (EP,US);
H02J13/00 (US);
H02J13/00024 (US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP);
Y02E40/70 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/123 (EP);
Y04S10/30 (EP);
Y04S40/126 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSYSTEME MIT WECHSELRICHTEREINGANGSSPANNUNGSREGELUNG | [2020/12] | English: | POWER SYSTEMS WITH INVERTER INPUT VOLTAGE CONTROL | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ALIMENTATION AYANT UNE COMMANDE DE TENSION D'ENTRÉE D'ONDULEUR | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 16.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015372490 (BAKAS PANAGIOTIS [SE], et al); | [XI]CN106300433 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD); | [P]US2018131321 (XU JUN [CN], et al) | International search | [X]CN201234142Y (JIANGSU JINGHEN ENERGY SCI TEC [CN]); | [A]US2013026756 (ANDRESEN BJOERN [DK], et al); | [X]CN103094922 (UNIV XI AN TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN103401269 (NINGBO INST TECH ZHEJIANG UNIV); | [A]CN106026172 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) | by applicant | US2015372490 | CN106300433 | US2018131321 |