EP3621511 - AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF OCT RETINAL SCANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eyekor, LLC 6527 Normandy Lane 100 Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yijun c/o EyeKor LLC 6527 Normandy Lane 100 Madison WI 53711 / US | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18797626.1 | 11.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018US32211 | Priority number, date | US201762505393P | 12.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762505393 P | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018209174 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3621511 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, G06T7/00, G16H30/20, G16H40/67, G16H50/20, G16H50/50 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B3/102 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (US);
A61B5/004 (US);
A61B5/0066 (US);
A61B5/4842 (US);
A61B5/4848 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/10 (US);
G16H30/20 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
G06T2207/10101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/20096 (EP);
G06T2207/20216 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | A61B3/10, A61B3/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE ANALYSE VON OCT-HORNHAUTSCANS | [2020/12] | English: | AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF OCT RETINAL SCANS | [2020/12] | French: | ANALYSE AUTOMATISÉE DE BALAYAGES RÉTINIENS TCO | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007276269 (YUN SEOK-HYUN [US], et al); | [A]US2011141259 (NAKANO YUTA [JP]); | International search | [YA]US2007276269 (YUN SEOK-HYUN [US], et al); | [Y]US2011103658 (DAVIS JOHN [US], et al); | [YA]US2011141259 (NAKANO YUTA [JP]); | [Y]US2013128222 (HUANG DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007276269 | US2011141259 |