EP3621426 - AUTOMATED VERTICAL PLANT CULTIVATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiro, Daniel S. 4260 N. Brown Avenue Scottsdale, Arizona 85251 / US | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/12] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18797961.2 | 07.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018US31429 | Priority number, date | US201715589845 | 08.05.2017 Original published format: US201715589845 | US201762592246P | 29.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762592246 P | US201815885157 | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US201815885157 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208686 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3621426 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3621426 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/06, A01G9/24, A01G9/029 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
A01G31/06 (EP,US);
A01G9/0293 (EP);
A01G9/249 (EP);
A01G7/045 (US);
A01G9/023 (US);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | A01G9/02, A01G9/12, A01G9/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES VERTIKALES PFLANZENZUCHTSYSTEM | [2020/12] | English: | AUTOMATED VERTICAL PLANT CULTIVATION SYSTEM | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈME AUTOMATISÉ VERTICAL DE CULTURE DE PLANTES | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19214341.0 / EP3666064 | EP23163789.3 / EP4233526 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008047275 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 11; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2009301979 (TANAKA MICHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0007]; figure 11 *; | [A]US2011000807 (SNELTEN JEROEN [NL], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [Y]KR101212130B (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0041] - [0046] - [0079]; figures 2,4,7; claim 9 *; | [A]US2014250778 (SUNTYCH JON DAREN [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0085] - [0087] * | International search | [A]US6134832 (BOKMILLER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2003145519 (WINSBURY BARRY [GB]) [Y] 6, 8 * ; paragraphs [0011], [0017], [0018], [0021]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2012019382 (KOEHLER MORITZ [CH], et al) [Y] 1, 3-6, 8, 9 * ; figures 5A, 5B; paragraphs [0038], [0039], [0079], [0080], [0085] *; | [A]US2014000162 (BLANK TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1-9* ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2017024353 (E AGRI PTE LTD [SG]) [Y] 1, 3-6, 8, 9 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0044], [0045], [0106], [0109]; figures 4, 24, 25 * | by applicant | WO2008047275 | KR101212130B |