06.09.2024 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.06.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] |
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.08.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.04.2023 |
First examination report |
|
14.04.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.02.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
17.07.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
17.07.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
30.06.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
21.02.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
21.02.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|