EP3688394 - REAL-TIME MONITORING OF A MULTI-ZONE VERTICAL FURNACE WITH EARLY DETECTION OF A FAILURE OF A HEATING ZONE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X-FAB Semiconductor Foundries GmbH Haarbergstrasse 67 99097 Erfurt / DE | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER, Sven Lessingstr. 18 01689 Weinboehla / DE | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard @ Friends Patentanwälte Maximilianstrasse 2 Palais an der Oper 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Tal 30 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18799591.5 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018IB57414 | Priority number, date | DE201710122205 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017122205 | DE201810101010 | 18.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018101010 | [2020/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058358 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688394 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F27B17/00, G01R31/28, F27D21/00, H01L21/67, H04M3/08, H05B3/14, G01R31/02, F27D19/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H01L21/67248 (EP,KR,US);
F27D21/0014 (EP,KR);
F27B17/0025 (EP,KR,US);
F27D19/00 (EP,KR);
G01R27/14 (US);
G01R31/52 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67098 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67109 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67288 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | ECHTZEIT MONITORING EINES MEHRZONEN-VERTIKALOFENS MIT FRUEHZEITIGER ERKENNUNG EINES AUSFALLS EINES HEIZZONEN-ELEMENTS | [2020/32] | English: | REAL-TIME MONITORING OF A MULTI-ZONE VERTICAL FURNACE WITH EARLY DETECTION OF A FAILURE OF A HEATING ZONE ELEMENT | [2020/32] | French: | SURVEILLANCE EN TEMPS RÉEL D'UN FOUR VERTICAL À PLUSIEURS ZONES, DOTÉE D'UNE DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE DE L'ARRÊT D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE ZONE CHAUFFANTE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 31.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002352938 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2005056635 (SUZUKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [X]JP2006085907 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUCTOR) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0 17] *; | [X]JP2006165200 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUCTOR) [X] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]US2008262791 (TERASAWA NOBUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]JP2009281837 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]JP2011108596 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC SEMICONDUCTOR SERVICE INC) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [X]US2012097661 (SINGH HARMEET [US]) [X] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]JP2017073498 (NUFLARE TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1-23* abstract * | by applicant | DE3910676 | US2009237102 | US2010014749 |