EP3697937 - COMPACT COIL ASSEMBLY FOR A VACUUM ARC REMELTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Titanium Metals Corporation 181 North Water Street Gate 3 Henderson, NV 89015 / US | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Ashish D. 1624 Ethan Drive Wyomissing. PA 19610 / US | 02 /
SENSENIG, Jeremy L. 177 Cantamar Street Henderson, NV 89074 / US | 03 /
MCFARLAND, Robert James Jr. 523 Landra Ln. Henderson, NV 89015 / US | 04 /
PHILLIPS, James Leroy 251 East Longacres Drive Hendersaon, NV 89015 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
PATEL, Ashish, D. 1624 Ethan Drive Wyomissing PA 19610 / US | ||
02 /
SENSENIG, Jeremy, L. 177 Cantamar Street Henderson NV 89074 / US | |||
03 /
MCFARLAND, Robert, James, Jr. 523 Landra Ln. Henderson NV 89015 / US | |||
04 /
PHILLIPS, James, Leroy 251 East Longacres Drive Hendersaon NV 89015 / US | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2023/34] |
Former [2020/35] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18799943.8 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56302 | Priority number, date | US201762573229P | 17.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762573229 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019079463 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697937 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3697937 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22B9/20, F27D11/08, H05B7/20, // F27D7/06, F27D19/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
C22B9/20 (EP,US);
C22B9/04 (RU);
C22B9/221 (US);
F27D11/08 (EP);
H05B7/20 (EP,US);
F27D2007/066 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | C22B9/04, C22B9/20, F27B3/08, F27D11/06, F27D11/08, H05B6/34, H05B7/07, H05B7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE SPULENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE VAKUUM-LICHTBOGEN-UMSCHMELZANLAGE | [2022/01] | English: | COMPACT COIL ASSEMBLY FOR A VACUUM ARC REMELTING SYSTEM | [2020/35] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE BOBINES COMPACTES POUR UN SYSTÈME DE REFUSION À ARC SOUS VIDE | [2022/01] |
Former [2020/35] | KOMPAKTE SPULENANORDNUNG FÜR EIN VAKUUMLICHTBOGENUMSCHMELZSYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/35] | ENSEMBLE DE BOBINE COMPACT POUR SYSTÈME DE REFUSION À L'ARC SOUS VIDE | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 20.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23192685.8 / EP4290982 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | LU | 17.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.10.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB953800 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,15 * figures 1, 4, 6 * * page 1, line 34 - line 42 * * page 1, line 48 - line 52 * * page 3, line 27 - line 65 * * page 3, line 83 - line 106 *; | [XA]US3246373 (LYMAN RICHARD E) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 59 - line 62 *[A] 9,10; | [XD]US4581745 (MATHEWS DAVID R [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,11-13 * figures 1, 4, 6 * * page 3, line 19 - line 44 * * page 5, line 38 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 3 - line 53 * * page 1, line 17 - line 21 * | by applicant | US4581745 |