EP3691514 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTING THE VISUAL AND/OR VISUAL-MOTOR BEHAVIOUR OF A PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | For all designated states Université de Montréal 2900 Boulevard Edouard-Montpetit Montreal, QC H3T 1J4 / CA | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROBE, Björn c/o Essilor International 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | 02 /
FAUBERT, Jocelyn c/o Université de Montréal 2900 Boulevard Edouard-Montpetit Montréal Québec H3T 1J4 / CA | 03 /
GIRAUDET, Guillaume c/o Essilor International 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-Le-Pont / FR | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18800040.0 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP76717 | Priority number, date | EP20170306314 | 02.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17306314 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068671 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691514 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A61B3/0091 (EP,KR);
A61B3/0025 (EP,KR);
A61H5/00 (US);
A61H5/005 (KR);
A61B3/02 (US);
A61H2201/5007 (US);
A61H2201/5043 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ANPASSUNG DES VISUELLEN UND/ODER VISUELL-MOTORISCHEN VERHALTENS EINER PERSON | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTING THE VISUAL AND/OR VISUAL-MOTOR BEHAVIOUR OF A PERSON | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ADAPTATION DU COMPORTEMENT VISUEL ET/OU VISUEL-MOTEUR D'UNE PERSONNE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 20.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003075783 (MASUNAGA OPTICAL MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2015124574 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 13-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 6 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 3 * * page 13, lines 8-07 * * page 14, lines 10-17 * * page 15, lines 6-17 *; | [A]WO2017144933 (ESSILOR INT (COMPAGNIE GÉNÉRALE D'OPTIQUE) [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2010002191 | WO2016055265 | - S. GONG et al., Image and Vision Computing, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 873 - 888 | - O. ELOKA et al., Vision Research, (20110000), vol. 51, pages 925 - 931 |