EP3710849 - AMPLITUDE GONIOMETER AND ASSOCIATED PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUCHE-COSTES, Clémentine Thales Systèmes Aéroportés 10 Avenue de la 1ère DFL CS93801 29238 Brest Cedex 3 / FR | 02 /
JAHAN, Daniel Thales Systèmes Aéroportés 10 avenue de la 1ère DFL 29238 Brest Cedex 3 / FR | 03 /
BREUIL, Nicolas Thales Systèmes Aéroportés 2 avenue Gay-Lussac 78851 Elancourt / FR | 04 /
GUARDIA, Vincent Thales Systèmes Aéroportés 10 avenue de la 1ère DFL CS93801 29238 Brest Cedex 3 / FR | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18800211.7 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018EP81501 | Priority number, date | FR20170001184 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1701184 | [2020/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096966 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710849 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/46, G01S3/18, G01S3/04, G01S7/02 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G01S3/46 (EP,US);
G01S3/18 (EP,US);
G01S3/043 (EP,US);
G01S7/021 (EP,US);
G01S3/14 (US);
G01S3/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | AMPLITUDENGONIOMETER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE PLATTFORM | [2020/39] | English: | AMPLITUDE GONIOMETER AND ASSOCIATED PLATFORM | [2020/39] | French: | GONIOMÈTRE D'AMPLITUDE ET PLATE-FORME ASSOCIÉE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 15.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005035894 (DEAN MICHAEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0151]; figure 7 *; | [XI]FR3028320 (THALES SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,8-12 * page 14, lines 5-21; figure 9 * [I] 3,4,6,7; | [A]WO2016186998 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 * | by applicant | WO2004097450 | WO2010069683 |