Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3710849
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.01.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2023 |
First examination report |
|
14.09.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
11.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
21.08.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
21.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
27.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
16.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
21.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|