Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11592514 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020400771 | 24.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP81501 | 16.11.2018 | FR1701184 | 16.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3710849 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP81501 | 16.11.2018 | FR1701184 | 16.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019096966 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1701184 | 16.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3073628 | 29.11.2019 | B1 | FR3073628 | 17.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1701184 | 16.11.2017 |