EP3697449 - TREATMENT OF OCULAR DISEASES AND METASTATIC COLON CANCER WITH HUMAN POST-TRANSLATIONALLY MODIFIED VEGF-TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENXBIO Inc. 9600 Blackwell Road Suite 210 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANOS, Olivier 1349 Lexington Ave., Apt. 4G New York NY 10128 / US | 02 /
WU, Zhuchun 14716 Soft Wind Dr. North Potomac MD 20878 / US | 03 /
GERNER, Franz 3546 Brethren Church Road Myersville MD 21773 / US | 04 /
VAN EVEREN, Sherri 823 Paulson Circle Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18800376.8 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56343 | Priority number, date | US201762574038P | 18.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762574038 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019079494 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697449 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/85, C12N15/864, A61K38/17, C07K14/475 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K38/179 (EP);
A61K48/0058 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/0051 (US);
C07K14/475 (EP);
C07K14/71 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K35/761 (EP);
A61K38/00 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61K48/0075 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
C07K2319/33 (US);
C07K2319/90 (US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14151 (US);
C12N2800/22 (EP,US);
C12N2830/002 (US);
C12N2830/50 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | 18.05.2020 | ME | 18.05.2020 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENKRANKHEITEN UND METASTASIERENDEM DICKDARMKREBS MIT MENSCHLICHER POST-TRANSLATIONAL MODIFIZIERTER VEGF-FALLE | [2020/35] | English: | TREATMENT OF OCULAR DISEASES AND METASTATIC COLON CANCER WITH HUMAN POST-TRANSLATIONALLY MODIFIED VEGF-TRAP | [2020/35] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES OCULAIRES ET D'UN CANCER DU CÔLON MÉTASTATIQUE AVEC UN PIÈGE À VEGF AVEC MODIFICATION POST-TRADUCTIONNELLE HUMAIN | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 18.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103304668 (JIANGSU JIANDE BIOLOG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [A] 28 * example 3 *; | [XP]WO2018160686 (ADVERUM BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1-8,19-26* paragraphs [0009] , [0182]; claims 1,17 *; | [XY] - HARDING ET AL, "AAV Serotype 8-Mediated Gene Delivery of a Soluble VEGF Receptor to the CNS for the Treatment of Glioblastoma", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS ; NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (20060501), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.YMTHE.2006.02.004, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 956 - 966, XP005416312 [X] 1-4,27 * page 957, column r, lines 7-10; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8,21-26,29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2006.02.004 | [I] - NICHOLAS A. MOORE ET AL, "Gene therapy for age-related macular degeneration", EXPERT OPINION ON BIOLOGICAL THERAPY, ASHLEY, LONDON; GB, (20170720), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:10.1080/14712598.2017.1356817, ISSN 1471-2598, pages 1235 - 1244, XP055404429 [I] 5,6,19,20,23 * page 1239, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 1239, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14712598.2017.1356817 | [I] - JENNIFER DUMONT ET AL, "Human cell lines for biopharmaceutical manufacturing: history, status, and future perspectives", CRC CRITICAL REVIEWS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20150918), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266, ISSN 0738-8551, pages 1110 - 1122, XP055532666 [I] 9-18,28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266 | [A] - JEFFREY S. HEIER ET AL, "Intravitreal Aflibercept (VEGF Trap-Eye) in Wet Age-related Macular Degeneration", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (20121201), vol. 119, no. 12, doi:10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.09.006, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 2537 - 2548, XP055138976 [A] 1-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2012.09.006 | [Y] - TZU-FEI WANG ET AL, "Aflibercept in the Treatment of Metastatic Colorectal Cancer", CLINICAL MEDICINE INSIGHTS: ONCOLOGY, NZL, (20120101), vol. 6, doi:10.4137/CMO.S7432, ISSN 1179-5549, XP055533035 [Y] 7,8,21-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4137/CMO.S7432 | [Y] - MARTIN LOCK ET AL, "Rapid, Simple, and Versatile Manufacturing of Recombinant Adeno-Associated Viral Vectors at Scale", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, US, (20101001), vol. 21, no. 10, doi:10.1089/hum.2010.055, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 1259 - 1271, XP055533316 [Y] 29 * page 1260, column r, paragraph l - page 1261, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2010.055 | [A] - Deniz Dalkara ET AL, "In vivo-directed evolution of a new adeno-associated virus for therapeutic outer retinal gene delivery from the vitreous", Science translational medicine, United States, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3005708, (20130612), pages 189ra76 - 189ra76, URL: http://stm.sciencemag.org/content/scitransmed/5/189/189ra76.full.pdf, (20181212), XP055533378 [A] 6 * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3005708 | [A] - MINH NGUYEN ET AL, "Rapamycin-regulated Control of Antiangiogenic Tumor Therapy Following rAAV-mediated Gene Transfer", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, US, (20070501), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1038/mt.sj.6300079, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 912 - 920, XP055233214 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.sj.6300079 | [A] - IGARASHI TSUTOMO ET AL, "Adeno-Associated Vector (Type 8) Mediated Expression of Flt-1 Efficiently Inhibits Neovascularization in a Murine Choroidal Neovascularization Model", Molecular Therapy, vol. 17, no. Supplement 1, ISSN 1525-0016, (20090501), Database accession no. 751, page S287, MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS ; NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, URL: http://www.cell.com/molecular-therapy-family/molecular-therapy/pdf/S1525-0016%2816%2939111-0.pdf, (20181212), XP008183816 [A] 5,6,23 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9418317 | WO9620951 | WO9641865 | WO9910508 | WO9910510 | WO9936553 | WO9941258 | US6596535 | US7067526 | US7125717 | US7282199 | US7456683 | US7790449 | US7906111 | US8318480 | US2013224836 | US8524446 | US8628966 | US8734809 | US8927514 | US8962332 | US8999678 | US2015126588 | US9169299 | US9193956 | US2015374803 | US9284357 | US2016215024 | US9409953 | US9458517 | US2016376323 | US2017051257 | US9587282 | US9585971 | US2017067908 | WO2018075798 | - MITCHELL; BRADLEY, Health Qual Life Outcomes, (20060000), vol. 4, page 97 | - BROWN, N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 355, pages 1432 - 1444 | - ROSENFELD, N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 355, pages 1419 - 1431 | - SCHMIDT-ERFURTH, Ophthalmology, (20140000), vol. 121, no. 1, pages 193 - 201 | - BENDER et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20120000), vol. 18, page 5081 | - SCHODEL et al., Blood, (20110000), vol. 117, no. 23, pages e207 - e217 | - KENNETH; ROCHA, Biochem J., (20080000), vol. 414, pages 19 - 29 | - TSUCHIYA, J. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 113, page 395 | - SALVI, Biochemistry and Biophysics Reports, (20170000), vol. 9, pages 13 - 21 | - POWELL; RIVERA-SOTO, Discov. Med., (20150000), vol. 19, no. 102, pages 49 - 57 | - QUAX et al., Mol Cell, (20150000), vol. 59, pages 149 - 161 | - ANDERSEN, J Biol Chem, (20120000), vol. 287, pages 22927 - 22937 | - CHEN, "Fusion protein linkers: property, design and functionality", Adv. Drug. Deliv., (20130000), vol. 65, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2012.09.039, pages 1357 - 1369, XP028737352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2012.09.039 | - AVERY et al., Retina, the Journal of Retinal and Vitreous Diseases, (20170000), vol. 0, pages 1 - 12 | - AVERY et al., Br J Ophthalmol, (20140000), vol. 98, pages 1636 - 1641 | - WANG et al., Analytical Biochem., (20130000), vol. 427, pages 20 - 28 | - ADAMIS et al., BBRC, (19930000), vol. 193, pages 631 - 638 | - KANAN et al., Exp. Eye Res., (20090000), vol. 89, pages 559 - 567 | - KANAN; AL-UBAIDI, Exp. Eye Res., (20150000), vol. 133, pages 126 - 131 | - CLERC et al., Glycoconj, (20160000), vol. 33, pages 309 - 343 | - POMPACH et al., J Proteome Res., (20140000), vol. 13, pages 5561 - 5569 | - E MISHIRO, J Biochem, (20060000), vol. 140, pages 731 - 737 | - BOVENKAMP et al., J. Immunol., (20160000), vol. 196, pages 1435 - 1441 | - DUMONT et al., Critical Rev in Biotech, (20150000), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 1110 - 1122 | - BOSQUES, Nat Biotech, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 1153 - 1156 | - YANG et al., Molecules, (20150000), vol. 20, pages 2138 - 2164 | - LOOS et al., PNAS, (20150000), vol. 112, pages 12675 - 12680 | - CHOE et al., Cell, (20030000), vol. 114, pages 161 - 170 | - MIKKELSEN; EZBAN, Biochemistry, (19910000), vol. 30, pages 1533 - 1537 | - FARID-MOAYER et al., J. Bacteriol., (20070000), vol. 189, pages 8088 - 8098 | - DUMONT et al., "Human cell lines for biopharmaceutical manufacturing: history, status, and future perspectives", Critical Rev in Biotech, (20150000), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:doi:10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266, pages 1110 - 1122, XP055333163 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266 | - SCHUMAN, Trans. Am. Opthalmol. Soc., (20080000), vol. 106, pages 426 - 458 | - HOLASH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (20020000), vol. 99, no. 17, page 11393 | - DE OLIVEIRA DIAS et al., Int J Retin Vitr, (20160000), vol. 2, page 3 | - QUAX et al., Mol. Cell, (20150000), vol. 59, pages 149 - 161 | - DING et al., MAbs, (20170000), vol. 9, pages 269 - 284 | - KIM, Eur J Immunol, (19990000), vol. 29, page 2819 | - REGULA, EMBO Mol Med, (20160000), vol. 8, pages 1265 - 1288 | - VAN DEN BREMER et al., mAbs, (20150000), vol. 7, pages 672 - 680 | - HU et al., Biotechnol. Prog., (20170000), vol. 33, pages 786 - 794 | - HANSSON et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20150000), vol. 290, no. 9, pages 5661 - 5672 | - ZINN et al., Cell Rep., (20150000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 1056 - 1068 | - WU, Human Gene Therapy, (20070000), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 171 - 182 | - MCCARTY et al., Gene Therapy, (20010000), vol. 8, no. 16, pages 1248 - 1254 | - ALBA et al., "Gutless adenovirus: last generation adenovirus for gene therapy", Gene Therapy, (20050000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.gt.3302612, pages S18 - S27, XP008102765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302612 | - LESCH et al., "Production and purification of lentiviral vector generated in 293T suspension cells with baculoviral vectors", Gene Therapy, (20110000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1038/gt.2010.162, pages 531 - 538, XP055339732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2010.162 | - AUSUBEL et al., "Production of CGMP-Grade Lentiviral Vectors", Bioprocess Int., (20120000), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 32 - 43, XP055324289 | - DINCULESCU et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20050000), vol. 16, pages 649 - 663 | - TSUCHIYA et al., J. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 113, pages 395 - 400 | - STERN et al., Trends Cell. Mol. Biol., (20070000), vol. 2, pages 1 - 17 | - DALTON; BARTON, Protein Sci, (20140000), vol. 23, pages 517 - 525 | - GURTU et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19960000), vol. 229, no. 1, pages 295 - 298 | - FURLING et al., Gene Ther, (20010000), vol. 8, no. 11, pages 854 - 873 | - FANG et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 584 - 590 | - FANG, Mol Ther, (20070000), vol. 15, pages 1153 - 1159 | - FANG et al., Molecular Therapy, (20070000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1153 - 1159 | - LUKE, Innovations in Biotechnology, (20120000), pages 161 - 186 | - YAN et al., J. Virol., (20050000), vol. 79, no. 1, pages 364 - 379 | - APONTE-UBILLUS et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20180000), vol. 102, pages 1045 - 1054 | - ROHRER, J.S., "Analyzing Sialic Acids Using High-Performance Anion-Exchange Chromatography with Pulsed Amperometric Detection", Anal. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 283, pages 3 - 9 | - HARA et al., "Highly Sensitive Determination of N-Acetyl-and N-Glycolylneuraminic Acids in Human Serum and Urine and Rat Serum by Reversed-Phase Liquid Chromatography with Fluorescence Detection", J. Chromatogr., B: Biomed., (19890000), vol. 377, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(00)80766-5, pages 111 - 119, XP026513701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)80766-5 | - GALILI et al., "A sensitive assay for measuring alpha-Gal epitope expression on cells by a monoclonal anti-Gal antibody", Transplantation, (19980000), vol. 65, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1097/00007890-199804270-00020, pages 1129 - 1132, XP001097939 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-199804270-00020 | - AYOUB et al., "Correct primary structure assessment and extensive glyco-profiling of cetuximab by a combination of intact, middle-up, middle-down and bottom-up ESI and MALDI mass spectrometry techniques", Landes Bioscience, (20130000), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:doi:10.4161/mabs.25423, pages 699 - 710, XP055102410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.25423 | - PLATTS-MILLS et al., "Anaphylaxis to the Carbohydrate Side-Chain Alpha-gal", Immunol Allergy Clin North Am., (20150000), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 247 - 260 | - SONG et al., Anal. Chem., (20140000), vol. 86, pages 5661 - 5666 | - CAMPOCHIARO et al., Hum Gen Ther, (20160926), URL: doi: 10.1089/hum.2016.117 | - PATEL et al., Invest Ophth & Vis Sci, (20120000), vol. 53, pages 4433 - 4441 | - PATEL et al., Pharm Res, (20110000), vol. 28, pages 166 - 176 | - OLSEN, Am J Ophth, (20060000), vol. 142, pages 777 - 787 | - SCHUMAN, Trans. Am. Opthamol. Soc., (20080000), vol. 106, pages 426 - 458 | WO2014EP76466 | WO2015EP53335 | WO2015US34799 |