EP3727312 - PROCESS FOR TREATING HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICKER, Andreas Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
AST, Andrea Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
YOUNAS, Huma Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
MOLENDA, Michael Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Grit, Mustafa Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18800950.0 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP81164 | Priority number, date | EP20170209516 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17209516 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019120766 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727312 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61K8/64, A61Q5/12, A61K8/898, A61K8/19 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/65 (US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (US);
A61K8/34 (US);
A61K8/35 (US);
A61K8/362 (US);
A61K8/415 (US);
A61K8/416 (US);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/55 (US);
A61K8/64 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HAARBEHANDLUNG | [2020/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING HAIR | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT CAPILLAIRE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017041906 (KAO GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017041909 (KAO GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | WO9515144 | EP1738739 | EP1769788 | EP1915981 |